MD HB17 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation to use a fair market value determined in accordance with certain provisions of law for up to 2 years after the date on which the Foundation was first requested in writing to purchase the easement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation - Valuation of Easement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2020-02-18HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-02-17HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-01-09HouseHearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-01-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2019-08-28HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB244 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-20 - Third Reading Passed (46-0)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Agriculture2511(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback