MD HB17 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring institutions of postsecondary education to provide certain education loan information annually to each undergraduate student enrolled in the institution who applies for federal student aid in the applicable award year; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Student Loan Notification Letter - Modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359 |
2018-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {564061/1 Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2017-10-02 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Community Colleges
Education
Federal Government
Higher Education
Liability
Loans
Notices
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Education
Federal Government
Higher Education
Liability
Loans
Notices
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students