MD HB17 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-09 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the number of clock hours of continuing education instruction a licensee must complete to qualify for renewal of a license to provide real estate brokerage services; requiring specified licensees to take a course that outlines real estate laws in neighboring states as a condition of license renewal on or after January 1, 2017; etc.
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Continuing Education - Comparative Law Course
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2015-02-03 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-14 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2014-11-20 | House | Pre-filed |