MD HB1697 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 83-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Second Reading Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to limit the uses of certain revenues to educational opportunities and programs for the children of the State in public schools, the advancement of educators, and the construction of school facilities; requiring the Governor to include in the budget submission certain amounts in certain fiscal years as supplemental funding for certain purposes; requiring that certain funding be in addition to certain State funding provided for certain grades in public schools; etc.
Title
Education - Commercial Gaming Revenues - Constitutional Amendment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-2) (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2018-04-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-2) |
2018-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-06 | House | Special Order until later this session (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {144563/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2018-02-26 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations and Ways and Means |
2018-02-15 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Constitutional Amendments
Construction
Education
Gaming
Higher Education
Operating Budget
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Referendum
Revenue and Taxes
Teachers
Constitutional Amendments
Construction
Education
Gaming
Higher Education
Operating Budget
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Referendum
Revenue and Taxes
Teachers