MD HB169 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a person to hunt turkey on private property on Sundays during the spring turkey hunting season in Carroll County; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Carroll County - Turkey Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-1) (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-6) (Y: 129 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-6) (Y: 129 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-1) |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-6) |
2016-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-21 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Birds
Blue Laws
Carroll County
Emergency Bills
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources, Department of
Real Property
Blue Laws
Carroll County
Emergency Bills
Hunting
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources, Department of
Real Property