MD HB167 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 776
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 776
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a county or municipality to require a specified at-will supervisory employee to reside in the State, county, or municipality or within a certain distance of the State, county, or municipality as a condition of employment under specified circumstances; providing that a local law, ordinance, or policy enacted or adopted under the Act shall apply only prospectively; etc.
Title
Counties and Municipalities - At-Will Supervisory Employees - Residency Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Cory McCray [D] | Del. Carl Anderton [R] | Del. Erek Barron [D] | Del. Andrew Cassilly [R] |
Sen. Antonio Hayes [D] | Del. Tony Knotts [D] | Del. David Moon [D] | Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Del. William Wivell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-18) (Y: 118 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (118-18) (Y: 118 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 776 |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (118-18) |
2017-02-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {454569/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2017-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-19 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Counties
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Public Employees
Residency
Work, Labor and Employment
Local Government - Generally
Municipal Corporations
Public Employees
Residency
Work, Labor and Employment