MD HB1663 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 14
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Governor to take certain actions as a result of the issuance by the Governor on March 5, 2020, of the proclamation declaring a state of emergency for the duration of a certain emergency; providing that a certain violation is subject to certain provisions of law under certain circumstances; providing that a certain alternative workweek may allow an employee to work certain hours or shifts; requiring that an employee authorized to work an alternative workweek is considered a full-time employee; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Government – State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency – Authority of Governor and Unemployment Insurance Benefits (COVID–19 Public Health Emergency Protection Act of 2020)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-19HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 14
2020-03-18HousePassed Enrolled
2020-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (131-3)
2020-03-18HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-03-17SenateMotion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Kelley) Adopted
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments {327771/1 Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2020-03-17SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (131-3)
2020-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-15HouseFloor Amendment {183228/1 (Delegate Pendergrass) Adopted
2020-03-15HouseMotion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Cullison) Adopted
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFloor Committee Amendment {606981/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseMotion Special Order until End Of This Calendar (Delegate Cullison) Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFloor Committee Amendment {116484/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseMotion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Cullison) Adopted
2020-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {316586/1 Adopted
2020-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-03-10HouseHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-06HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2020-03-09HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2020-03-09HouseMotion Rules Suspend to Refer (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (133-0)
2020-03-09HouseMotion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (133-0)

Same As/Similar To

SB1080 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB1663?ys=2020RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1663f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1663t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb1663e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/Chapters_noln/CH_14_hb1663e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1663_31658601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1663_11648401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1663_60698101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1663_18322801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2020RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1663_32777101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/hb1663_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes_comm/hb1663_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0416.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0417.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/0945.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/Senate/0969.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/votes/House/1192.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback