MD HB166 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-13 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that a license issued by the State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners entitles an individual to provide massage therapy treatment; requiring a person to hold a certain permit before establishing or operating a massage therapy establishment in the State; providing that these permits are not transferable and shall be displayed conspicuously; authorizing the Board to perform certain inspections; requiring the Board to provide assistance to the Maryland Human Trafficking Task Force, law enforcement, and others; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Massage Therapy Examiners - Revisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2018-01-30 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-17 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Advertising
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Background Investigations
Fingerprinting
Health
Health Occupations
Hearings
Human Rights
Inspections
Judicial Review
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Massage
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Background Investigations
Fingerprinting
Health
Health Occupations
Hearings
Human Rights
Inspections
Judicial Review
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Massage
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations