MD HB166 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the effective dates of specified regulations adopted under the Administrative Procedure Act.
Title
State Government - Administrative Procedure Act - Effective Date of Adopted Regulations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {976688/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-01-29 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Administrative Procedure Act
Budget and Management, Department of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Environmental Health
Federal Government
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Maryland Register
Medical Assistance
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Safety
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Administrative Procedure Act
Budget and Management, Department of
Education, State Board of
Education, State Department of
Environmental Health
Federal Government
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Maryland Register
Medical Assistance
Natural Resources, Department of
Rules and Regulations
Safety
State Government - Regulations and Procedures