MD HB1658 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $300,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of The Maryland Center for Veterans Education and Training, Incorporated for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of the Maryland Center for Veterans Education and Training Intensive Outpatient Treatment Building, located in Baltimore City; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Baltimore City - Maryland Center for Veterans Education and Training
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Delegate P. Young) Adopted (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 11:30 a.m. |
2017-03-10 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m. |
2017-03-09 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-08 | House | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate P. Young) Adopted (132-0) |
2017-03-08 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |