MD HB163 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-31 - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "adjusted actual income" under the State child support guidelines; providing for the calculation of a specified allowance required to be deducted from adjusted actual income under the child support guidelines; requiring that the amount of a specified allowance be subtracted from a parent's actual income before the court determines the amount of a child support award; etc.
Title
Child Support - Adjusted Actual Income - Multifamily Adjustment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-35) (Y: 99 N: 35 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-35) |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-09 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2015-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-28 | House | First Reading Judiciary |