MD HB1622 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a certain applicant or licensee is subject to a certain minority business participation goal established by the Special Secretary for the Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs; requiring a certain certification agency, in consultation with the General Assembly and the Office of the Attorney General, to study the Minority Business Enterprise Program to evaluate the program's compliance with certain requirements and to report to the Legislative Policy Committee by December 14, 2018; etc.
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Sunset Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 335 |
2018-03-27 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {555266/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Attorney General
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Gaming
General Assembly
Minorities
Procurement
Reports
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Women
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Gaming
General Assembly
Minorities
Procurement
Reports
Small Business
State Government - Procurement
Sunset
Women