MD HB1621 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $60,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Arundel Lodge, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of the Arundel Lodge, located in Anne Arundel County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Arundel Lodge
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m. |
2017-03-07 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-02-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Mental and Behavioral Health
Sewage
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)
Substance Abuse
Mental and Behavioral Health
Sewage
State Bonds
State Debt (Bond Bills)
Substance Abuse