MD HB162 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring and authorizing the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to take certain actions relating to body-worn cameras; adding misconduct related to the improper use of body-worn cameras, equipment, and technology to a certain disciplinary matrix; requiring the development and publication online of a policy for the disclosure of body-worn camera recordings and data to the public; providing training to law enforcement officers regarding policies related to and the use of body-worn cameras, equipment or technology; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement - Body-Worn Cameras
Sponsors
Del. Jazz Lewis [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2021-10-29 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB558 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-03 - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Contracts
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Cybersecurity
Data
Discipline
Equipment
Information Technology, Department of
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Open Government
Police Conduct
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Recordings
Records
Reports
Video
Crime Prev., Youth, and Victim Service, Governor's Office of
Cybersecurity
Data
Discipline
Equipment
Information Technology, Department of
Job Training
Law Enforcement
Open Government
Police Conduct
Police Training and Standards Commission
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Recordings
Records
Reports
Video
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 3 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 3 | 511 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0162?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/hb/hb0162f.pdf |