MD HB1613 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Making certain provisions relating to the appointment or designation of a standby guardian of the person or property of a minor in cases of incapacity, debilitation, or death of a parent applicable to the appointment or designation of a standby guardian of the person or property of a minor in the event of an adverse immigration action being initiated against a parent; etc.
Title
Appointment or Designation of Standby Guardian - Adverse Immigration Action
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (130-6) (Y: 131 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-6) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {312316/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Contracts
Courts
Emergency Bills
Estates and Trusts
Immigrants and Citizenship
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Records
Residency
State Documents
Courts
Emergency Bills
Estates and Trusts
Immigrants and Citizenship
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Records
Residency
State Documents