MD HB1593 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $280,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Prince George's Arts and Humanities Council, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of multiple transit oriented development public art projects, located in Prince George's County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Transit Oriented Development Public Art Projects
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2017-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m. |
2017-02-27 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2017-02-22 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |