MD HB1578 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Hearing canceled
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Expressing the sense of the General Assembly that facial recognition technology can present certain risks as well as provide a variety of benefits and that safeguards are necessary to allow the use of the technology in ways that benefit society; establishing certain requirements and certain prohibited actions relating to provision of facial recognition services by certain persons; prohibiting certain governmental units from using facial recognition services under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Facial Recognition Privacy Protection Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseHearing canceled
2020-03-03HouseHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-02HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2020-02-12HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations

Same As/Similar To

SB476 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Commercial Law144201(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law144202(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law144203(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law144204(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law144205(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law144206(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law144207(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government101701(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government101702(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government101703(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government101704(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government101705(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government101706(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government101707(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government101708(n/a)See Bill Text
State Government101709(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback