MD HB1572 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Attorney General to create and maintain an itemized budget system for the accounting and use of funds spent in furtherance of lawsuits against the federal government; specifying that the itemized budget system shall be made available to the public under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Attorney General - Federal Government Lawsuits - Itemized Budget System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2018-03-08 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-09 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Attorney General
Budgets
Civil Actions
Federal Government
Public Information
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Budgets
Civil Actions
Federal Government
Public Information
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials