MD HB156 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 371
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the date for the start of the term for a member elected to serve on the Talbot County Board of Education from January 1 to December 1 after the member's election.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Talbot County Board of Education – Start Date of Term for Members

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 371
2018-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2018-03-30SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-30SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2018-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-17HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2018-02-01HouseHearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
2018-01-17HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback