MD HB156 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the fees for specified beer, beer and light wine, and beer, wine and liquor licenses in Carroll County in a specified manner.
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Fee Increases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-8) (Y: 126 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-8) (Y: 126 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 524 |
2014-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (126-8) |
2014-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-10 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-17 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Carroll County
Fees
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Carroll County
Fees