MD HB1558 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting specified persons from purchasing, selling, reselling, distributing, dispensing, or giving away to any person in the State specified unpackaged cigarettes; prohibiting a person from making available for use by another person a tobacco product rolling machine to produce an unpackaged cigarette; providing that a person who possesses, sells, or attempts to sell specified cigarettes is in violation of a specified provision of law; establishing penalties for a violation of specified provisions of the Act; etc.
Title
Commercial Law - Sales of Unpackaged Cigarettes - Prohibitions and Penalties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Unfavorable Report by Finance | |
2010-04-09 | Re-referred Finance | |
2010-04-03 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2010-03-30 | Third Reading Passed (132-4) | |
2010-03-28 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-28 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-03-24 | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-22 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2010-03-16 | Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-03-16 | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Benson) Adopted (134-0) | |
2010-03-16 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |