MD HB1556 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 486
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 486
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting the number of times certain contracts entered into by Calvert County that require the payment of funds from appropriations of more than one fiscal year may be renewed.
Title
Calvert County - Procurement - Contract Renewal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 486 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Banks and Trust Companies
Calvert County
Contracts
Counties - Local Laws
Health Insurance
Investments
Procurement
Retirement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Calvert County
Contracts
Counties - Local Laws
Health Insurance
Investments
Procurement
Retirement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Calvert County | 6 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |