MD HB1542 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-08 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Newborn Screening Program Fund; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to administer the Fund; providing for the uses, purposes, sources of funding, investment of money, and auditing of the Fund; providing that the Fund is a continuing, nonlapsing fund not subject to specified provisions of law; requiring the Secretary to pay specified fees to the Comptroller; requiring the Comptroller to distribute the specified fees to the Newborn Screening Program Fund; etc.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Newborn Screening Program Fund - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (ODonnell) Adopted (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (ODonnell) Adopted (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Dyson) Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {307873/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Dyson) Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {307873/1 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Dyson) Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {307873/1 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Dyson) Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {307873/1 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {336887/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-10 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-06 | House | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted (136-0) |
2014-03-06 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Auditors and Audits
Examinations
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Minors
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes
Examinations
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Minors
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes