MD HB154 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 972
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 972
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to accept an application for the homeowners' property tax credit submitted by a homeowner within 3 years after April 15 of the taxable year for which the credit is sought if the homeowner is enrolled in the Homeowner Protection Program; and providing for the calculation of the homestead property tax credit for certain homeowners under certain circumstances.
Title
Homeowners' and Homestead Property Tax Credits - Application Filing Deadline - Extension
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 972 |
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2024-04-05 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {153529/1 Adopted |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2024-02-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2024-02-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-02-13 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-02-12 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2024-01-05 | House | Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2023-09-10 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB286 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 973
Subjects
Age
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Elderly Persons
Homestead Property Tax Credit
Property Tax
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Time
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Elderly Persons
Homestead Property Tax Credit
Property Tax
Sunset
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - Property | 9 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |