MD HB154 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 83
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 83
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination date for certain provisions of the used vehicle inspection law applicable to the electronic submission of an inspection certificate; authorizing the Automotive Safety Enforcement Division of the Department of State Police to require electronic submission of an inspection certificate for a used motor vehicle; and repealing the requirement that the Division authorize the use of inspection certificate forms for the submission of an inspection certificate.
Title
Motor Vehicles – Electronic Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 118 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 118 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 83 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-2) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2020-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (118-17) |
2020-02-25 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {510119/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Forms
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicles
Safety
State Police, Department of
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Communication
Electronic Government
Forms
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicles
Safety
State Police, Department of
Sunset
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2014 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Chapter of the Acts | 2017 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Transportation | 23 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 23 | 108.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |