MD HB154 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the date on which the registration of a pharmacy benefits manager expires unless the registration is renewed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Registration Expiration Date

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-24 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 113
2017-04-04HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-03SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-03-31SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-03-31SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-03-31SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2017-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-15SenateRereferred to Finance
2017-02-27SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2017-02-24HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2017-02-22HouseSecond Reading Passed
2017-02-22HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2017-02-21HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2017-02-09HouseHearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-18HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback