MD HB154 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing to $7,500 the maximum amount of a claim against the Maryland Home Builder Guaranty Fund for which the Consumer Protection Division may issue a specified proposed order; and increasing to 60 the number of days, following specified notice by the Division, after which the Division may bring a specified action in court against a registered home builder who fails to reimburse the Fund in full for payment of a specified claim.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Home Builder Registration Act - Guaranty Fund - Claims

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 224
2015-04-13HouseReturned Passed
2015-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2015-04-10SenateSecond Reading Passed
2015-04-10SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2015-04-10SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2015-04-01SenateHearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-27SenateFirst Reading Finance
2015-02-26HouseThird Reading Passed (134-1)
2015-02-24HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-02-24HouseFavorable with Amendments {313195/1 Report Adopted
2015-02-23HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2015-02-10HouseHearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-01-28HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0154&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2015rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/hb/hb0154f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/hb/hb0154t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/Chapters_noln/CH_224_hb0154t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0154_31319501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0154.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/hb0154_ecm.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/hb0154_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0154,h-0105&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0154,s-0998&stab=02&ys=2015RS

Bill Comments

feedback