MD HB154 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 587
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Increasing to 16 the number of members on the Sport Fisheries Advisory Commission; and requiring that one member of the Sport Fisheries Advisory Commission be a specified member of the Tidal Fisheries Advisory Commission.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - Sport Fisheries Advisory Commission - Membership

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (121-0) (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 587
2014-03-27HouseReturned Passed
2014-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2014-03-26SenateSecond Reading Passed
2014-03-26SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2014-03-26SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-03-11SenateHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-14SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2014-02-13HouseThird Reading Passed (121-0)
2014-02-11HouseSecond Reading Passed
2014-02-11HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2014-02-10HouseFavorable Report by Environmental Matters
2014-02-05HouseHearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
2014-01-29HouseHearing cancelled
2014-01-29HouseHearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
2014-01-15HouseFirst Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback