MD HB154 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-08 - Special Order until later today (Senator Muse)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring specified employers to give notice through a universal disclosure form to specified employees whose employment is not covered employment for purposes of unemployment insurance benefits; requiring specified employers to require specified employees to sign the universal disclosure form; and requiring the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation to create the universal disclosure form and post the form on the Department's Web site.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unemployment Insurance - Religious Organizations - Disclosure of Exemption from

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-08 Special Order until later today (Senator Muse)
2011-04-07 Special Order until later today (Senator Muse)
2011-04-07 Favorable Report Adopted
2011-04-11 Favorable Report by Finance
2011-04-09 Hearing 4/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-04-09 Re-referred Finance
2011-04-03 First Reading Senate Rules
2011-04-02 Third Reading Passed (137-0)
2011-03-31 Second Reading Passed
2011-03-31 Favorable Report Adopted
2011-04-05 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
2011-02-14 Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-14 Hearing cancelled
2011-02-04 Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-01-26 First Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback