MD HB1539 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that certain general contractors are jointly and severally liable for certain violations of the wage payment and collection law by a subcontractor regardless of whether the subcontractor is in a direct contractual relationship with the general contractor; requiring a subcontractor to indemnify a general contractor for certain wages, damages, interest, penalties, and fees except under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment – General Contractor Liability for Unpaid Wages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-13) (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Floor - Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted (93-47) (Y: 94 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-53) (Y: 88 N: 54 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {433220/1 (Delegate Jacobs) Rejected (48-87) (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2018-03-19 - House - House Floor - Motion Special Order Until 3/27 (Delegate Long) Rejected (48-87) (Y: 49 N: 88 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (32-13)
2018-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-06SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-06SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2018-04-04SenateHearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-04-02SenateRereferred to Finance
2018-03-27SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2018-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed (87-53)
2018-03-27HouseMotion vote previous question (Delegate Ebersole) Adopted (93-47)
2018-03-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-26HouseMotion Special Order until 3/27 (Delegate Long) Rejected (48-87)
2018-03-26HouseFloor Amendment {433220/1 (Delegate Jacobs) Rejected (48-87)
2018-03-23HouseSpecial Order until 3/26 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2018-03-23HouseFavorable with Amendments {213698/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-23HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2018-03-13HouseHearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-09HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1539&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1539f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb1539t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/hb1539_21369801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0009/hb1539_43322001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb1539.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1539_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0839.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0840.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0858.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0859.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb1539_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1302.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback