MD HB153 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing in Montgomery County the establishment of a dispensary for the sale of alcoholic beverages in a retail grocery store under certain conditions.
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages - Dispensaries in Retail Grocery Stores MC 16-18
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2018-02-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-17 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Boundaries
Montgomery County
Retail Sales
Weights and Measures
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Boundaries
Montgomery County
Retail Sales
Weights and Measures