MD HB152 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing or altering the distribution of specified revenue; altering or repealing specified required appropriations; authorizing the use of specified funds for specified purposes; requiring the Department of Budget and Management to review specified interagency agreements; requiring the Department of Commerce to report specified information relating to the compliance of specified companies with a specified letter of intent; requiring a specified financial forecast to maximize the use of specified funds; etc.
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2017
Sponsors
Del. The Speaker [?] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-25) (Y: 115 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-6) (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {243720/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-33) (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-29) (Y: 112 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {273929/1 (Delegate McMillan) Rejected (48-88) (Y: 48 N: 88 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Committee Amendment (#22) Adopted (89-51) (Y: 89 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (42-5) (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-6) (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment {243720/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-33) (Y: 14 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-29) (Y: 112 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {273929/1 (Delegate McMillan) Rejected (48-88) (Y: 48 N: 88 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Committee Amendment (#22) Adopted (89-51) (Y: 89 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Readings Passed with Amendments (42-5) (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23 |
2017-03-28 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-5) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (115-25) |
2017-03-28 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | (Senators McFadden, Ferguson and Serafini) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate advisors: |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senators Kasemeyer, DeGrange, Madaleno, King, and Edwards |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2017-03-24 | House | (Delegates Haynes, B. Barnes and A. Miller) |
2017-03-24 | House | House advisors: |
2017-03-24 | House | Delegates McIntosh, Gaines, Jones, Reznik, and Beitzel |
2017-03-24 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2017-03-24 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2017-03-24 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (41-6) |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Floor Amendment {243720/1 (Senator Bates) Rejected (14-33) |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#18-22) Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#14-17) Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#10-13) Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#5-9) Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment (#1-4) Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {129234/1 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {129234/1 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Suspend Rule 52 (Senator Kasemeyer) Adopted |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {129234/1 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (112-29) |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment {273929/1 (Delegate McMillan) Rejected (48-88) |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Amendment (#32) Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Amendment (#31) Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Amendment (#30) Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Amendment (#30-32) |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Amendment (#29) Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Amendment (#25-28) Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Amendment (#23-24) Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Amendment (#22) Adopted (89-51) |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Amendment (#19-21) Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Amendment (#19-24) |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Amendment (#13-18) Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Amendment (#8-12) Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Committee Amendment (#1-7) Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Special Order until 03/15 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {954468/1 |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2017-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m. |
2017-01-18 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Appropriations
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Awards, Medals and Prizes
Baltimore City
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Comptroller
Counties
Fees
Gaming
Grants
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Commission
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Higher Education
Human Resources, Department of
Income Tax
Legislative Services, Department of
Local Government Mandates
Medical Assistance
Operating Budget
Prices
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Racing
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Sunset
Teachers
Transportation, Department of
Appropriations
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Awards, Medals and Prizes
Baltimore City
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Comptroller
Counties
Fees
Gaming
Grants
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Commission
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Higher Education
Human Resources, Department of
Income Tax
Legislative Services, Department of
Local Government Mandates
Medical Assistance
Operating Budget
Prices
Public Schools
Public Works, Board of
Racing
Revenue and Taxes
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Sunset
Teachers
Transportation, Department of