MD HB1517 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 to change the grantee for a grant for the Cumberland City Market from the Mayor and City Council of the City of Cumberland to the Canal Place Preservation and Development Authority; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2011 - Allegany County - Cumberland City Market
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2013-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-05 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-03-04 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Allegany County
Commerce and Business
Municipal Corporations
Prior Authorizations
Public Buildings and Facilities
State Bonds
Commerce and Business
Municipal Corporations
Prior Authorizations
Public Buildings and Facilities
State Bonds