MD HB1513 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 513
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing the Maryland Historic Trust Grant Fund to be used to pay for specified reasonable and necessary administrative costs, not to exceed 5% of the specified appropriation to the MHT Grant Fund; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2018, to include an appropriation of $1,500,000 to the Fund in the annual State budget bill subject to specified limitations; limiting to 10% of all grants awarded the amount of grants from the Fund that may be awarded to historic properties owned by the Maryland Historic Trust; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Historic Trust Grant Fund Improvement Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-5) (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 513
2017-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2017-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2017-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed
2017-04-04SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2017-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2017-03-30SenateHearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-03-20SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2017-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (134-5)
2017-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2017-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {204167/1 Report Adopted
2017-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2017-03-02HouseHearing 3/02 at 3:00 p.m.
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb1513&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2017rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1513f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/bills/hb/hb1513t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/Chapters_noln/CH_513_hb1513t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2017RS/amds/bil_0003/hb1513_20416701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb1513.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb1513_app.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2017RS/votes_comm/hb1513_b&t.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1513,h-0776&stab=02&ys=2017RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb1513,s-1141&stab=02&ys=2017RS

Bill Comments

feedback