MD HB1510 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Merging the Alcohol and Drug Abuse Administration and the Mental Hygiene Administration in the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to establish the Behavioral Health Administration in the Department; establishing the responsibilities, powers, and duties of the Director of the Behavioral Health Administration; requiring substance use disorder programs and mental health programs to be licensed by the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene, with specified exceptions; repealing a specified prohibition; etc.
Title
Behavioral Health Administration - Establishment and Duties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-1) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460 |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-1) |
2014-04-07 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {177574/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2014-04-03 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {216584/2 Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 12:30 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-03 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-27 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Discipline
Discrimination
Fees
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Hospitals
Inspections
Licenses
Medical Research
Mental Health
Notices
Public Health
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Discipline
Discrimination
Fees
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Hospitals
Inspections
Licenses
Medical Research
Mental Health
Notices
Public Health
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse