MD HB151 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the transfer of certain alcoholic beverages licenses from certain areas in Baltimore City to other areas in Baltimore City; specifying that a certain license is considered unexpired until July 1, 2019, for a certain purpose; and specifying that, unless transferred to another location, a certain license expires not later than July 1, 2019.
Title
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages – License Transfers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {824433/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-17 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Emergency Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Boundaries
Emergency Bills