MD HB1502 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-2)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Task Force to Expand Dual Language Programs in Maryland; requiring the Task Force to create a framework for dual language immersion programs in the State, recommend strategies to increase the number of dual language programs in the State, and identify potential funding sources; requiring the Task Force to report its recommendations to the Governor, the Senate Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee, and the House Appropriations Committee on or before specified dates; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Task Force to Expand Dual Language Programs in Maryland

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-18HouseUnfavorable Report by Ways and Means
2017-03-07HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-16HouseHearing canceled
2017-03-10HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback