MD HB1502 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Child Support Enforcement Administration, in cooperation with specified entities, to develop and implement a Noncustodial Parent Employment Assistance Pilot Program in Baltimore City; requiring the Program components to include each eligible noncustodial parent making a choice to participate in the Program, the provision of employment assistance services in accordance with court-issued consent orders, intensive case management, and strict enforcement procedures; etc.
Title
Child Support Enforcement - Noncustodial Parent Employment Assistance Pilot Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312 |
2016-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2016-04-11 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {498978/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Circuit Courts
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Drivers' Licenses
Education
Family Law
Human Resources, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Sunset
Support of Dependents
Work, Labor and Employment
Circuit Courts
Committees and Commissions
Community Facilities and Services
Drivers' Licenses
Education
Family Law
Human Resources, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Licenses
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Sunset
Support of Dependents
Work, Labor and Employment