MD HB150 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Montgomery County Board of Education Compensation Commission to study the salaries of the members of the Montgomery County Board of Education; providing for the membership, appointment, removal, terms, chair, meeting requirements, and staffing of the Commission; requiring the Commission to issue a report and make recommendations to the members of the Montgomery County delegation to the General Assembly regarding the compensation of the members of the Board by September 1, 2019, and every 4 years thereafter; etc.
Title
Montgomery County Board of Education Compensation Commission MC 1-18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121 |
2018-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-05 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-17 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
General Assembly
Legislation
Montgomery County
Reports
Salaries and Compensation
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
General Assembly
Legislation
Montgomery County
Reports
Salaries and Compensation