MD HB15 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding the extraordinary medical expenses of a destitute adult child with a developmental disability to the support required from the destitute adult child's parent if the parent has or is able to earn sufficient means to provide the support; providing that a court may divide the support obligation for the extraordinary medical expenses of a destitute adult child with a developmental disability between the destitute adult child's parents in proportion to the parents' income; etc.
Title
Family Law - Destitute Adults - Extraordinary Medical Expenses for Developmental Disabilities and Civil Action
Sponsors
Del. Mark Chang [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-01-19 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 3:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2016-11-04 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Developmental Disabilities
Family Law
Health
Vulnerable Adults
Civil Actions and Procedures
Developmental Disabilities
Family Law
Health
Vulnerable Adults