MD HB1493 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-27 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from making in bad faith a specified assertion regarding a Web site or other electronic communication failing to comply with the federal Americans with Disabilities Act; authorizing a court to consider specified factors as evidence of whether a person has made a specified assertion in bad faith or in good faith; altering the authority of the Division of Consumer Protection of the Office of the Attorney General to take specified actions; etc.
Title
Commercial Law - Assertions Made in Bad Faith - Prohibition
Sponsors
Del. C.T. Wilson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2017-02-23 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Attorney General
Civil Actions
Commercial Law - Generally
Consumer Protection
Damages
Disabilities
Electronic Communication
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Civil Actions
Commercial Law - Generally
Consumer Protection
Damages
Disabilities
Electronic Communication
Telecommunications and Information Technology