MD HB149 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the salary of the County Commissioners of Somerset County from $7,500 to $8,500 for each Commissioner and from $8,500 to $9,500 for the President; altering the limit on reimbursements that each Commissioner may receive for specified expenses from $2,500 to $3,000; and providing for the application of the Act.
Title
Somerset County - Commissioners - Salary and Expense Reimbursements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2016-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {880013/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
Reimbursement Rates
Salaries and Compensation
Somerset County
County Commissioners
Reimbursement Rates
Salaries and Compensation
Somerset County