MD HB1487 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an action for repossession for failure to pay rent to contain a statement on whether the property is an affected property under specified lead-based paint abatement laws; requiring a court to dismiss an action for repossession for failure to pay rent that does not include specified information concerning the affected property; altering specified time frames for scheduling a trial date and serving a summons; authorizing a court to adjourn a specified trial to obtain documents or other proof of a claim or defense; etc.
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-42) (Y: 97 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-42) |
2017-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {620314/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Claims
Courts
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Real Property
Sheriffs
Courts
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Real Property
Sheriffs