MD HB1487 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt not to exceed $250,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Girl Scouts of Central Maryland, Inc. for specified development or improvement purposes related to the Camp Whippoorwill Living Shoreline Project including the installation and development of a living shoreline, located in Anne Arundel County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds, subject to a requirement that the grantee provide and expend a matching fund; etc.
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Camp Whippoorwill Living Shoreline Project
Sponsors
Del. Mary Love [D] | Sen. Pamela Beidle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 10:00 a.m. |
2014-02-26 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2014-02-24 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |