MD HB1476 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 699
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 699
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, beginning in fiscal year 2018 and each fiscal year thereafter, the Governor to include $3,000,000 in the annual budget bill for the Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program within the Department of Housing and Community Development.
Title
Housing and Community Development - Shelter and Transitional Housing Facilities Grant Program - Mandated Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-49) (Y: 90 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-49) (Y: 90 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 699 |
2016-04-11 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (90-49) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2016-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-12 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Assisted Living
Economic and Community Development
Grants
Group Homes
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Assisted Living
Economic and Community Development
Grants
Group Homes
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of