MD HB1476 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 to add the Mayor and Commissioners of the Town of Perryville as a grantee to a specified grant; extending the deadline for the grantees to present evidence that a matching fund will be provided; requiring that the Board of Public Works expend or encumber the proceeds of a specified loan by June 1, 2014; and making the Act an emergency measure.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Cecil County - Lower
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Rudolph) Adopted (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Rudolph) Adopted (Y: 132 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-02 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-04-01 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-01 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-07 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-04-06 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-04-06 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2012-03-29 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2012-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-29 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2012-03-28 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-28 | Favorable with Amendments 174165/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | Re-referred Appropriations | |
2012-03-17 | Referred House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-03-17 | Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Delegate Rudolph) Adopted (132-2) | |
2012-03-17 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |