MD HB147 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-30 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain county boards of education to allow a high school teacher to teach a dual enrollment course offered by an institution of higher education if the teacher has earned a master's degree or higher degree in the field of instruction or has earned a certain degree, has taught a college-level course, has received certain professional development, and has been observed and approved for instruction by a particular faculty member.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - High School Teachers Teaching Dual Enrollment Courses - Qualifications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-30HouseUnfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
2020-01-28HouseHearing canceled
2020-01-16HouseHearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-15HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education6124(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback