MD HB147 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Legalizing the 2016 Edition of the Somerset County Code of Public Local Laws and any supplement to the extent to which that code or supplement contains laws enacted by the General Assembly.
Title
Somerset County Code of Public Local Laws - 2016 Edition - Legalization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2016-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |