MD HB1464 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that part-time physicians and physician assistants are eligible for participation in the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants; authorizing the Maryland Department of Health to establish prorated loan repayment assistance for part-time physicians and physician assistants; and establishing the Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program Advisory Council for Physicians and Physician Assistants to assist the Department in the administration of the Program.
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants - Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396 |
2022-04-11 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2022-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-1) |
2022-04-11 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (41-0) |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {403722/1 Adopted |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-1) |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-18 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-03-16 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-03-16 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2022-02-25 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB626 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 395
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Loans
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Reports
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Loans
Physician Assistants
Physicians
Reports
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 24 | 1703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 24 | 1708 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |