MD HB1464 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 846
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-27 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 846
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Make Office Vacancies Extinct Program in the Department of Commerce; providing that the purposes of the Program is to encourage the location of new businesses in the State in counties with a support program to reduce office space vacancies; establishing qualifications for participation in the Program; authorizing the Program to provide for specified grants to specified businesses on a first-come, first-served basis, subject to a specified limitation; establishing a Make Office Vacancies Extinct Matching Fund; etc.
Title
Make Office Vacancies Extinct Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-11) (Y: 125 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-11) (Y: 125 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-27 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 846 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-11) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {753596/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Counties
Economic and Community Development
Grants
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment
Commerce, Department of
Counties
Economic and Community Development
Grants
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Work, Labor and Employment